This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:59 (UTC).

NANCY MCNAMARA VS. GIULIA MERAGE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 NANCY MCNAMARA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GIULIA MERAGE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NANCY MCNAMARA

Defendant

GIULIA MERAGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2016
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MERAGE, GIULIA ON 11/17/2016; Filing Party: MERAGE, GIULIA ON 11/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 11/10/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 11/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY 8 DAYS A WEEK PROFESSIONAL MONITORS FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12030327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11854332.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/18/2016; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 08/10/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY MERAGE, GIULIA ON 07/26/2016; Filing Party: MERAGE, GIULIA ON 07/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/21/2016 04:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 03/09/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 03/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/21/2016 AT 04:00:00 PM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DOE, JOHN FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926992 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751217.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306899 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:41:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.