This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 04:12:40 (UTC).

MUNA ABU-ALFOTOUH VS. ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 MUNA ABU-ALFOTOUH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Muna Abu-Alfotouh

Defendant

Orange Coast Memorial Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Gene J. Goldsman

Defendant Attorney

Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/03/2022 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/03/2022 08:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/19/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/19/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 01/14/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 01/14/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12992375 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12820276.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12992375 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12820276.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/07/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/07/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/07/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/07/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/04/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/04/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12990821 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12818740.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12990821 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12818740.

STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/04/2022

STIPULATION - OTHER FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/04/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/04/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/04/2022

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 12/13/2021

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 12/13/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 11/19/2021

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 11/19/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12973403 AND RECEIPT NU

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12973403 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12801320.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS RECEIVED ON 11/19/2021.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDERS RECEIVED ON 11/19/2021.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 11/19/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 11/19/2021

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 06/24/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 06/24/2021

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/03/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/28/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT N06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2022 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT N06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21111922 RECEIVED ON 01/19/2022 10:49:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31088548 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2021 11:54:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/02/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 06/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12904565 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12732384.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ABU-ALFOTOUH, MUNA ON 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41209397 RECEIVED ON 06/24/2021 01:23:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION; COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF LONG BEACH A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION; is a litigant