This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:32 (UTC).

MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT VS. DENNIS A. WILSON

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DENNIS A WILSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT

Defendants

DENNIS A. WILSON

PENNEY BAKER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 4.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11945572 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11769737.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 4.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11945572 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11769737.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/08/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/08/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/08/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY WILSON, DENNIS A. ON 03/28/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY WILSON, DENNIS A. ON 03/28/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BAKER, PENNEY; WILSON, DENNIS A. ON 03/08/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BAKER, PENNEY; WILSON, DENNIS A. ON 03/08/2016

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/05/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/05/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 02/26/2016

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY WILSON, DENNIS A. ON 03/14/2016

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY WILSON, DENNIS A. ON 03/14/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AZARTASH, MAHMOUD FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927176 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751401.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AZARTASH, MAHMOUD FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927176 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751401.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY WILSON, DENNIS A.; BAKER, PENNEY ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY WILSON, DENNIS A.; BAKER, PENNEY ON 03/15/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AZARTASH, MAHMOUD FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11962595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11786734.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AZARTASH, MAHMOUD FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11962595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11786734.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 04/18/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 04/18/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/12/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AZARTASH, MAHMOUD FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11962595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11786734.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • COURT TRIAL CONTINUED TO 05/12/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/12/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/05/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • WILSON, DENNIS A. REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 03/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY WILSON, DENNIS A. ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • BAKER, PENNY M. REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 03/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY BAKER, PENNY M. ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AZARTASH, MAHMOUD FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927176 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MTM REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less