This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 04:52:12 (UTC).

MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC VS. AMBULNZ HEALTH, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMBULNZ HEALTH, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MSS Properties Special Purpose II, LLC

Defendant

Ambulnz Health, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morasse Collins & Clark, APC

Defendant Attorney

Stimpert & Ford, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 04/27/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 04/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 04/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 04/27/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 04/27/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 04/27/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12880435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12708194.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12880435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12708194.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/05/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/05/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMBULNZ HEALTH, LLC ON 07/15/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMBULNZ HEALTH, LLC ON 07/15/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913800 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741672.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913800 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741672.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 09/09/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 09/09/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 09/23/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 09/23/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMBULNZ HEALTH, LLC ON 09/27/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMBULNZ HEALTH, LLC ON 09/27/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/01/2021 11:06:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/01/2021 11:06:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/01/2021 11:06:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/16/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMBULNZ HEALTH, LLC ON 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41245182 RECEIVED ON 09/27/2021 11:13:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913800 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741672.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMBULNZ HEALTH, LLC ON 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31039027 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2021 11:49:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/05/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12880435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12708194.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31008874 RECEIVED ON 04/27/2021 04:34:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 04/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II, LLC ON 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSS PROPERTIES SPECIAL PURPOSE II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant