This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 12:05:28 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. VS. TIMOTHY J. MCCORMACK

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TIMOTHY J MCCORMACK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mountain States Commercial Collections, Inc.

Defendant

Timothy J. McCormack

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaba Law

Defendant Attorney

Goe Forsythe & Hodges LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/14/2022

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/14/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13150883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12978980.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13150883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12978980.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 12/14/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 12/14/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2022-12-14 13:28:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2022-12-14 13:28:00.0.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 12/14/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 12/14/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21222775 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21222775 REJECTED.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11041556 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11041556 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13109463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12937476.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13109463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12937476.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 09/22/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 09/22/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 09/21/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 09/21/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 09/21/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 09/21/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/21/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/21/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/21/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/21/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/28/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/28/2022 09:00:00 AM.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21247243 RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022 09:00:56 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13150883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12978980.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41422897 RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022 09:00:57 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2022-12-14 13:28:00.0.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MCCORMACK, TIMOTHY J. ON 06/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 03/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31133338 RECEIVED ON 03/18/2022 11:12:46 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/28/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 02/07/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13005121 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12833073.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 02/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 02/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC. ON 02/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21119837 RECEIVED ON 02/07/2022 04:08:08 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNTAIN STATES COMMERCIAL COLLECTIONS, INC., a corporation is a litigant