This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2018 at 02:27:47 (UTC).

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. VS. PREMIER AUTOMOTIVE OF PLACENTIA, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PREMIER AUTOMOTIVE OF PLACENTIA, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC.

Defendant

PREMIER AUTOMOTIVE OF PLACENTIA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPIWAK & IEZZA, LLP

Defendant Attorney

PREMIER AUTOMOTIVE MANAGEMENT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 11/01/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 11/01/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12228685 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12052344.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12228685 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12052344.

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY PREMIER AUTOMOTIVE OF PLACENTIA, LLC ON 09/28/2017

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY PREMIER AUTOMOTIVE OF PLACENTIA, LLC ON 09/28/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 09/13/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 09/13/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12210578 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034273.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12210578 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034273.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 08/25/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 08/25/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 08/25/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 08/25/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 08/25/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 08/25/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2608449 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2017 03:16:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12228685 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12052344.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY PREMIER AUTOMOTIVE OF PLACENTIA, LLC ON 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3592140 RECEIVED ON 09/28/2017 02:53:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1420091 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2017 12:21:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12210578 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034273.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. ON 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2586519 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2017 10:25:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PREMIER AUTOMOTIVE OF PLACENTIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA PREMIER AUTOMOTIVE OF PLACENTIA is a litigant