This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 04:36:12 (UTC).

MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC VS. NETGNIX, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NETGNIX, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC

Defendant

NETGNIX, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER G. PARSONS

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/10/2018

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/10/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4801338 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4801338 REJECTED.

JUDGMENT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/04/2018

JUDGMENT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/04/2018

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/30/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/30/2017.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/30/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/30/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO ACCEPT COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 11/30/2017.

DECLARATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO ACCEPT COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 11/30/2017.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/30/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/30/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/30/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/30/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/28/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/28/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/28/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/28/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 10/24/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 10/24/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12241598 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065288.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12241598 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065288.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/24/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/24/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/24/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/24/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/24/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/24/2017

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4803642 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2018 11:01:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4801338 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/30/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3611396 RECEIVED ON 11/28/2017 07:31:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 10/24/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12241598 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065288.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1433666 RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017 10:14:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, INC. is a litigant