This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/04/2017 at 17:54:58 (UTC).

MORRI V DUTTON

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MORRI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DUTTON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7547

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michele Morri

Petitioner

MORRI, MICHELE

Defendant

Michael Dutton

Respondent

DUTTON, MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • HEARING - NOTICE - DISMISS - NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • NOTICE - DISMISS NO PROOF OF SERVICE 10/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 07/24/2014 14:04:00 GENERATED BY 300 DAY STATUS CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 03/20/2014 12:48:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 12/18/2013 14:34:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/12/2013 08:00:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MORRI, MICHELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SUMMONS 08/12/2013 08:00:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MORRI, MICHELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/12/2013 08:00:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MORRI, MICHELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/12/2013 08:00:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MORRI, MICHELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NEW FILED 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less