This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 09:50:56 (UTC).

MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC VS. KHANH TUAN TRAN

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against KHANH TUAN TRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morning View Hotels - BH I, LLC

Defendants

Khanh Tuan Tran

Lisa Tran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Law Offices of Geoffrey Long, A.P.C.

Law Offices of Ronald Richards & Associates, A.P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/12/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/12/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/12/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/12/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/12/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/12/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12911841 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12739720.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12911841 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12739720.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/14/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/14/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/27/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/27/2021

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/27/2021

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/27/2021

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/27/2021.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/27/2021.

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 08/18/2021

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 08/18/2021

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/27/2021

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/27/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12932447 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12760350.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12932447 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12760350.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 09/21/2021

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 09/21/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12945697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12773596.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12945697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12773596.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12945697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12773596.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1896478 RECEIVED ON 09/21/2021 06:21:03 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12932447 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12760350.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31043338 RECEIVED ON 07/27/2021 10:06:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31038455 RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021 11:15:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12911841 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12739720.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1869095 RECEIVED ON 07/12/2021 12:52:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 07/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MORNING VIEW HOTELS - BH I, LLC ON 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORNING VIEW HOTEL BH I & II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant