This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/24/2018 at 09:29:15 (UTC).

MORALES-THORN - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MORALES-THORN - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litems

ANTHONY S RAMIREZ

ANA L RAMIREZ

Minor

LEILANI N MORALES-THORN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • (P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/04/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) REVIEW HEARING 03/26/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • (P) REVIEW HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/04/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA; RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT ON 03/23/2017; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA; RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT ON 03/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA; RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT ON 03/23/2017; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA; RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT ON 03/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP RECEIVED ON 03/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR RECEIVED ON 03/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP SUBMITTED BY RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA REJECTED ON 03/08/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP RECEIVED ON 02/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2016
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CONSENT FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OR CONSERVATOR FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DUTIES OF GUARDIAN FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR(S) FILED BY RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, ANTHONY SCOTT; RAMIREZ, ANA LAURA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.