This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 15:17:00 (UTC).

MONICA ALKIRE VS MICHAEL ALKIRE

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 MONICA ALKIRE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MICHAEL ALKIRE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LA CRUZ, ANDRE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2057

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

DE LA CRUZ, ANDRE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALKIRE, MONICA B

Claimant

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA RETIREMENT SAVINGS PROGRAM(RSP)

Respondent

ALKIRE, MICHAEL T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUNN, NANCY BENNETT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS 03/13/2018

SUMMONS 03/13/2018

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/13/2018 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/13/2018 Amount:$435.00

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/13/2018

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/13/2018

RESPONSE / REPLY - OTHER 03/13/2018

RESPONSE / REPLY - OTHER 03/13/2018

RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTY FEES 03/13/2018 Property Control Amount:$60.00

RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTY FEES 03/13/2018 Property Control Amount:$60.00

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/13/2018

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/13/2018

NOTICE - OTHER 03/15/2018 Notice in Lieu of Subpoena to Compel Attendance

NOTICE - OTHER 03/15/2018 Notice in Lieu of Subpoena to Compel Attendance

CASE INFORMATION - FAMILY LAW 03/27/2018

CASE INFORMATION - FAMILY LAW 03/27/2018

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/27/2018

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/27/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/05/2018 Proof of Service of Summons (Summons)

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/05/2018 Proof of Service of Summons (Summons)

NOTICE - OTHER 04/06/2018 Notice of Adverse Interest (Notices)

NOTICE - OTHER 04/06/2018 Notice of Adverse Interest (Notices)

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 04/10/2018 Proof of Service of Discovery (Comment)

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 04/10/2018 Proof of Service of Discovery (Comment)

REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 04/23/2018 RSP

REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 04/23/2018 RSP

PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 04/23/2018 RSP

PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 04/23/2018 RSP

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/25/2018 Income and Expense Dec (Declarations)

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/25/2018 Income and Expense Dec (Declarations)

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/07/2018 Proof of Service (Comment)

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/07/2018 Proof of Service (Comment)

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/07/2018 Declaration regarding Service (Declarations)

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/07/2018 Declaration regarding Service (Declarations)

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/08/2018 Income and Expense Declaration

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/08/2018 Income and Expense Declaration

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 06/09/2020; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MICHAEL T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 05/27/2020; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/17/2019; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/04/2019 Proof of Service by Mail; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 09/04/2019 Proof of Personal Service; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION; Department: W10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CONTESTED 08/29/2019 Judge:DE LA CRUZ, ANDRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 08/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/29/2019; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER 03/15/2018 Notice in Lieu of Subpoena to Compel Attendance; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - FAMILY LAW; Department: L63

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - FAMILY LAW 03/13/2018 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - FAMILY LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 03/13/2018; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/13/2018 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/13/2018; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE / REPLY - OTHER 03/13/2018; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MICHAEL T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT & ATTY FEES 03/13/2018 Property Control Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/13/2018; Filing Party: ALKIRE, MONICA B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less