This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:14:52 (UTC).

MONA LENTINE VS. THU HUONG DANG

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MONA LENTINE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THU HUONG DANG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PETER LENTINE

MONA LENTINE

Defendants

THU HUONG DANG

APPLE NAILS AND SPA

SPA TECHNOLOGIES COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN WEISBERG

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL MAGUIRE & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (ADR REVIEW HEARING) FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 07/02/2014

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (ADR REVIEW HEARING) FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 07/02/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11465054 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11288946.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11465054 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11288946.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 01/27/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 01/27/2014

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER NAKAMURA, KIRK ON 08/12/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER NAKAMURA, KIRK ON 08/12/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11589751 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11413770.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11589751 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11413770.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 03/24/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 03/24/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 01/16/2015 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 01/16/2015 09:30:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 02/11/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 02/11/2015

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 04/02/2014

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 04/02/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/31/2014 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/31/2014 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/28/2014 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/28/2014 09:30:00 AM.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/29/2014

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/29/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 03/11/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 03/11/2014

SUPPLEMENTAL (PROOF OF SERVICE) FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 05/08/2014

SUPPLEMENTAL (PROOF OF SERVICE) FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 05/08/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 01/13/2015

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 01/13/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA 07/10/2014 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA 07/10/2014 02:00:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431441 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255313.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431441 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255313.

COMPLAINT FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 08/12/2013

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 02/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1230121 RECEIVED ON 02/11/2015 11:30:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 01/16/2015 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • ADR REVIEW HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/27/2015 AT 09:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • ADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/27/2015 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 01/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3236935 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2015 02:47:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 09/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2281401 RECEIVED ON 09/20/2013 05:03:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11465054 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11288946.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DANG, THU HUONG; APPLE NAILS AND SPA ON 09/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 480739 RECEIVED ON 09/20/2013 05:06:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER NAKAMURA, KIRK ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431441 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255313.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LENTINE, MONA; LENTINE, PETER ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348435 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 04:30:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less