This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 11:23:34 (UTC).

MOKHTARI V DIDAR

Case Summary

On 08/02/2013 MOKHTARI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DIDAR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7203

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darioush Mokhtari

Petitioner

MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

Defendant

Akram Didar

Respondent

DIDAR, AKRAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Meleka

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2015
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/01/2015 09:08:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 05/01/2015 09:08:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/01/2015 09:08:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: DIDAR, AKRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/01/2015 09:07:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • JUDGMENT 05/01/2015 09:07:00 # Pages:8; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • JUDGMENT - STIPULATED 05/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 04/28/2015 11:22:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JUDGMENT 12/16/2013 14:28:00 # Pages:12; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/16/2013 14:29:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JUDGMENT - DEFAULT - NO HEARING 12/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 11/08/2013 11:26:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/17/2013 11:32:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 10/01/2013 11:14:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 09/13/2013 10:30:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/02/2013 09:55:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/02/2013 09:55:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • SUMMONS 08/02/2013 09:55:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/02/2013 09:43:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: MOKHTARI, DARIOUSH

    Read MoreRead Less