This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/13/2020 at 06:45:56 (UTC).

MOHAMMAD SAEED KHARAZMI VS. MUSA OMRAN BAHIA

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 MOHAMMAD SAEED KHARAZMI filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MUSA OMRAN BAHIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mohammad Saeed Kharazmi

Newport Care, Inc.

Defendants

BYH, LLC

Musa Omran Bahia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C&K Law Group, APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED; NEWPORT CARE, INC. ON 12/30/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED; NEWPORT CARE, INC. ON 12/30/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED; NEWPORT CARE, INC. ON 12/30/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED; NEWPORT CARE, INC. ON 12/30/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED; NEWPORT CARE, INC. ON 12/30/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED; NEWPORT CARE, INC. ON 12/30/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12683644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12508543.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12683644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12508543.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 12/30/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 12/30/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED ON 01/28/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED ON 01/28/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED ON 01/28/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED ON 01/28/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED ON 01/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED ON 01/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1713866 RECEIVED ON 01/28/2020 06:25:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12683644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12508543.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2875026 RECEIVED ON 12/30/2019 05:43:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 12/30/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED; NEWPORT CARE, INC. ON 12/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED; NEWPORT CARE, INC. ON 12/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY KHARAZMI, MOHAMMAD SAEED; NEWPORT CARE, INC. ON 12/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less