This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 08:19:07 (UTC).

MOEZ, LLC VS. JVS DEVELOPMENT, LLC.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 MOEZ, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against JVS DEVELOPMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOEZ, LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Others

BROOKHURST TOWN CENTER, LLC

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY

ARTEMIS REALTY CAPITAL ADVISORS

JVS DEVELOPMENT, LLC.

WRW PROPERTIES, LLC

AMERILINK ESCROW, INC.

JIMMY PHAN

BURCH AND CRACCHIOLO P.A.

MI SU KIM

ADAN PHAN

JASMINE NGUYEN

NEWMARK KNIGHT FRANK

NATIONAL EQUITY FUNDING, INC.

STEPHEN NGUYEN

SGFC, LLC

DAVID TANG

GLENRICH PARTNERS, INC.

NATIONWIDE EXCHANGE CORPORATION

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY L. BOSSE

Brett M. Murdock

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Other Attorneys

The Law Offices of Alex L. Benedict & Associates, APLC

Samini Scheinberg, PC

Tran & Associate, APLC

HERSHORIN & HENRY, LLP

Other Attorneys

Samini Cohen Spanos LLP

THE LAW OFFICES OF ALEX L. BENEDICT &

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 07/15/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 07/15/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 07/12/2019

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 07/12/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 07/11/2019 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 07/11/2019 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 07/11/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 07/11/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 07/08/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 07/08/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 07/08/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 07/08/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 06/11/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 06/11/2019

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 06/17/2019

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 06/17/2019

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY PHAN, JIMMY ON 06/17/2019

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY PHAN, JIMMY ON 06/17/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 05/07/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 05/07/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12547946 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12371826.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12547946 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12371826.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 04/30/2019

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 04/30/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1615664 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1615664 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 04/25/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 04/25/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/24/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/24/2019 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12539116 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12362935.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12539116 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12362935.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF EX PARTE APPLICATION) FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 04/23/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF EX PARTE APPLICATION) FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 04/23/2019

172 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1644022 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2019 12:04:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 07/11/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AMERILINK ESCROW, INC. ON 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1643157 RECEIVED ON 07/11/2019 04:05:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SGFC, LLC ON 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1641628 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2019 03:31:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
277 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY MOEZ, LLC; TAHAMI, MOHAMAD ON 12/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY MOEZ, LLC; TAHAMI, MOHAMAD ON 12/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3616844 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2017 01:00:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 12/12/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12266134 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12089841.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MOEZ, LLC ON 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MOEZ, LLC ON 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MOEZ, LLC; TAHAMI, MOHAMAD ON 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1449015 RECEIVED ON 12/12/2017 10:25:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURCH AND CRACCHIOLO P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRW PROPERTIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SGFC LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant