This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/06/2019 at 21:31:13 (UTC).

MODERN MOTORS, INC. VS. SEGAL HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MODERN MOTORS, INC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against SEGAL HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MODERN MOTORS, INC.

Defendants and Debtor In Possession

KEVIN SEGAL

SEGAL HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITE

MARTYN SEGAL

SEGAL HOLDINGS, LLC

Assignee

JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES

Interested Party

JEFF SEGAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF DIMITRI P. GROSS

Defendant, Debtor In Possession and Interested Party Attorney

Krakowsky Michel

Assignee Attorney

JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 08/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 08/28/2013

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3729238 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3729238 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 06/10/2019

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 06/10/2019

ORDER - OTHER (TURNOVER ORDER) FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 07/08/2019

ORDER - OTHER (TURNOVER ORDER) FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 07/08/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12451240 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12274939.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12451240 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12274939.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 06/24/2019

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 06/24/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/25/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/25/2019 09:00:00 AM.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 03/12/2019

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 03/12/2019

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 03/04/2019

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 03/04/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 03/04/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 03/04/2019

JUDGMENT FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 01/07/2014

JUDGMENT FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 01/07/2014

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/22/14) RECEIVED ON 01/21/2014.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/22/14) RECEIVED ON 01/21/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431349 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255221.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431349 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255221.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/14/2018 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/14/2018 08:30:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2330794 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2330794 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12425647 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12249337.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12425647 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12249337.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 07/05/2019

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 07/05/2019

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 03/04/2019

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 03/04/2019

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3805776 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4992439 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2019 12:30:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/08/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (TURNOVER ORDER) FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 07/11/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • EX PARTE REASSIGNED TO C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 07/08/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY JUDICIAL JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES ON 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4987608 RECEIVED ON 07/05/2019 04:09:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 470112 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2013 01:28:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MUNOZ, GREGORY ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431349 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255221.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MODERN MOTORS, INC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462608 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 03:51:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less