This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/18/2017 at 09:35:44 (UTC).

MMM HOLDINGS, INC. VS. MARC REICH

Case Summary

On 11/24/2015 MMM HOLDINGS, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MARC REICH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

MMM HOLDINGS, INC.

MSO OF PUERTO RICO, INC.

Defendant

MARC REICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

ERVIN COHEN & JESSUP LLP

Defendant Attorney

SPACH, CAPALDI & WAGGAMAN, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY MMM HOLDINGS, INC.; MSO OF PUERTO RICO, INC. ON 07/07/2016

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY MMM HOLDINGS, INC.; MSO OF PUERTO RICO, INC. ON 07/07/2016

NOTICE OF APPEAL - UNLIMITED CIVIL FILED

NOTICE OF APPEAL - UNLIMITED CIVIL FILED

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 06/20/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 06/20/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 04/18/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 04/18/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 04/08/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 04/08/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 03/22/2016 09:03:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 03/22/2016 09:03:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926284 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11750495.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926284 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11750495.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MMM HOLDINGS, INC.; MSO OF PUERTO RICO, INC. ON 02/22/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MMM HOLDINGS, INC.; MSO OF PUERTO RICO, INC. ON 02/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 02/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 02/16/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 02/16/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 02/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11908475 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11732692.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11908475 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11732692.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11903086 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11727303.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11903086 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11727303.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 01/07/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 01/07/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11883714 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11707907.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11883714 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11707907.

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER G053739

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY MMM HOLDINGS, INC. FOR 224 - REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT IN THE AMOUNT OF 80.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12023883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11847894.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G053739

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12015862 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11839912.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (DISPOSITION OF FEES) FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 08/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1336786 RECEIVED ON 08/08/2016 03:12:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION - OTHER (EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY REICH, MARC ON 12/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4478562 RECEIVED ON 12/17/2015 01:30:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO MATHA GOODING EFFECTIVE 01/11/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MMM HOLDINGS, INC.; MSO OF PUERTO RICO, INC. ON 11/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1292176 RECEIVED ON 11/25/2015 03:22:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 11/24/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11883714 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11707907.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MMM HOLDINGS, INC.; MSO OF PUERTO RICO, INC. ON 11/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MMM HOLDINGS, INC.; MSO OF PUERTO RICO, INC. ON 11/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3355362 RECEIVED ON 11/24/2015 04:46:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MMM Holdings, Inc. is a litigant