This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 06:44:45 (UTC).

MKRTUM SAAKYAN VS. DENNIS DOUGLAS

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 MKRTUM SAAKYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DENNIS DOUGLAS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mkrtum Saakyan

Defendants

Lovingly, LLC

M's Flowers

Dennis Douglas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zwirn, Gevorkyan & Sogoyan LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Law Offices of John A. Hauser

Michael Maguire & Associates

 

Court Documents

CASE REASSIGNED TO CRAIG GRIFFIN EFFECTIVE 01/04/2021.

CASE REASSIGNED TO CRAIG GRIFFIN EFFECTIVE 01/04/2021.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF TRANSFER, RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/04/2020

NOTICE - OTHER (OF TRANSFER, RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/04/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY L.A. DEPOSITIONS, INC. FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12803083 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12630142.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY L.A. DEPOSITIONS, INC. FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12803083 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12630142.

RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD

RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD

REGISTER OF ACTIONS

REGISTER OF ACTIONS

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER RE ORDER TRANSFERRING THIS CASE TO ORANGE COUNTY [09/22/2020]) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER RE ORDER TRANSFERRING THIS CASE TO ORANGE COUNTY [09/22/2020]) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER RE ORDER TRANSFERRING THIS CASE TO ORANGE COUNTY [09/22/2020]) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER RE ORDER TRANSFERRING THIS CASE TO ORANGE COUNTY [09/22/2020]) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (04/30/2020) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (04/30/2020) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER [01/24/2020]) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS; LOVINGLY, LLC ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER [01/24/2020]) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS; LOVINGLY, LLC ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (01/17/2020) FILED ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (01/17/2020) FILED ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE OF ERRATA (01/08/2020) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS; LOVINGLY, LLC ON 10/14/2020

NOTICE OF ERRATA (01/08/2020) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS; LOVINGLY, LLC ON 10/14/2020

MOTION TO STRIKE (01/02/2020) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS; LOVINGLY, LLC ON 10/14/2020

MOTION TO STRIKE (01/02/2020) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS; LOVINGLY, LLC ON 10/14/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (12/06/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (12/06/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (12/05/2019)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (12/05/2019)

STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES (12/05/2019)

STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES (12/05/2019)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT (11/18/2019)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT (11/18/2019)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (11/18/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (11/18/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

COMPLAINT (11/18/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

COMPLAINT (11/18/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HUNT; Department: C23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO CRAIG GRIFFIN EFFECTIVE 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/14/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (OF TRANSFER, RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 11/03/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY L.A. DEPOSITIONS, INC. FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12803083 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12630142.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTER OF ACTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER (10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER RE ORDER TRANSFERRING THIS CASE TO ORANGE COUNTY [09/22/2020]) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS ON 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE (01/02/2020) FILED BY DOUGLAS, DENNIS; M'S FLOWERS; LOVINGLY, LLC ON 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (12/06/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (12/06/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (12/06/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING (12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES (12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT (11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (11/18/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (11/18/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (11/18/2019) FILED BY SAAKYAN, MKRTUM ON 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lovingly, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER