This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 09:11:25 (UTC).

MITCHELL REBACK VS. DRYBAR HOLDINGS, LLC.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 MITCHELL REBACK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DRYBAR HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitchell Reback

Defendant

Drybar Holdings, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Licenberg & Rhow, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

Koning Zollar LLP

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21057727 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21057727 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/23/2021 11:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/23/2021 11:45:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 09/23/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 09/23/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 09/20/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 09/20/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12934909 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12762808.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12934909 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12762808.

APPLICATION - OTHER (TO SEAL) FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 08/25/2021

APPLICATION - OTHER (TO SEAL) FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 08/25/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 08/25/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 08/25/2021

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12919114 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12746973.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12919114 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12746973.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/23/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/23/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12918880 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12746734.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12918880 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12746734.

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/20/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/20/2021

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/20/2021

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/20/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/20/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/20/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS, LLC. ON 03/05/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS, LLC. ON 03/05/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS, LLC. ON 03/05/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DRYBAR HOLDINGS, LLC. ON 03/05/2021

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21057727 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/23/2021 11:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT W02.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41244023 RECEIVED ON 09/23/2021 11:24:10 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 09/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31064375 RECEIVED ON 09/20/2021 11:57:55 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2937969 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2020 04:03:10 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/03/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2925408 RECEIVED ON 07/23/2020 10:47:03 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/23/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12757191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12583554.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1749890 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2020 12:36:14 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 07/07/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/07/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY REBACK, MITCHELL ON 07/07/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less