This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 02:26:32 (UTC).

MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC VS. ARRON CADINA

Case Summary

On 05/24/2016 MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARRON CADINA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

ARIELLE JOHNSTON

ARRON CADINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN E. BOUZANE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 05/24/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 05/24/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 05/24/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 05/24/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 05/24/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 05/24/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797591.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797591.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/08/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/08/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) SUBMITTED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC REJECTED ON 08/05/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) SUBMITTED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC REJECTED ON 08/05/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 09/08/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 09/08/2016 01:30:00 PM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 09/08/2016 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) SUBMITTED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC REJECTED ON 08/05/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 07/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4578053 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2016 12:30:13 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/08/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11973431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11797591.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 05/24/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 05/24/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MISSYONE INVESTMENTS LLC ON 05/24/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4552391 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016 04:47:02 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less