This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:26:37 (UTC).

MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP VS. STEVEN SELINSKY

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STEVEN SELINSKY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP

MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT,

Defendant

STEVEN SELINSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/08/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/08/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057112.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057112.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/13/2017 11:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/13/2017 11:00:00 AM.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVIE SUMMONS BY POSTIN) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/17/2017

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVIE SUMMONS BY POSTIN) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/17/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/08/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/08/2017 09:00:00 AM.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SELINSKY, STEVEN ON 10/17/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SELINSKY, STEVEN ON 10/17/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED 11/9/2017) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/08/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED 11/9/2017) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/08/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/9/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/9/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 12/01/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 12/01/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/18/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/18/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/9/2017) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/08/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/9/2017) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/08/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12251228 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12074954.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12251228 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12074954.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/13/2017 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12251228 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12074954.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 11/9/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED 11/9/2017) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/9/2017) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3606050 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017 03:38:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/08/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SELINSKY, STEVEN ON 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236659 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060339.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1430562 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017 02:22:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057112.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775652 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 12:51:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.