This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:31:30 (UTC).

MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP VS. OLIVIA L. SIEMON

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OLIVIA L SIEMON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP

MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT,

Defendant

OLIVIA L. SIEMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

WRIT (ISSUED 11/3/17) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/3/17) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12248050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071786.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12248050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071786.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233420 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057100.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233420 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057100.

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVIE SUMMONS BY POSTIN) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/17/2017

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVIE SUMMONS BY POSTIN) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/17/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236653 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060333.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236653 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060333.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/17/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/17/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/3/17) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/3/17) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017.

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12248050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071786.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 11/3/17) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/3/17) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3604231 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017 07:58:10 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVIE SUMMONS BY POSTIN) FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236653 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060333.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3597304 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017 02:17:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233420 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057100.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MISSION VIEJO OSO PARKWAY DEVELOPMENT, LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1428687 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 12:41:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.