This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 12:11:05 (UTC).

MIRNEZAM V GHANATTOUTI

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MIRNEZAM filed a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit against GHANATTOUTI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7473

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Mirnezam

Petitioner

MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

Defendant

Shohreh A. Ghanattouti

Respondent

GHANATTOUTI, SHOHREH ALIPOUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CLERK 10/21/2014 11:26:00 # Pages:2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • JUDGMENT 10/17/2014 09:22:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/17/2014 08:55:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/17/2014 08:55:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 10/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 08/27/2014 13:31:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CLERK 08/22/2014 09:40:00 # Pages:48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER 08/19/2014 13:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 07/24/2014 14:03:00 GENERATED BY 300 DAY STATUS CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - POSTING 03/11/2014 08:40:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - POSTING 03/05/2014 13:44:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 12/18/2013 14:33:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 10/09/2013 12:28:00 # Pages:6; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • ORDER - PUBLICATION OR POSTING 10/09/2013 12:27:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • APPLICATION - PUBLICATION / POSTING 10/09/2013 12:27:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/12/2013 08:28:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SUMMONS 08/12/2013 08:27:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION - NULLITY 08/12/2013 08:27:00 # Pages:6; Filing Party: MIRNEZAM, SHAWN

    Read MoreRead Less