Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/14/2020 at 10:18:06 (UTC).

MIHEE WOO VS SARAH WOO

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 MIHEE WOO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SARAH WOO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HENSON, CAROL L.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1172

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

HENSON, CAROL L.

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

WOO, MIHEE

WOO, SARAH HYE

WOO, SARAH HYE YOUNG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE 08/28/2020; Filing Party: WOO, MIHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 07/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING 07/30/2020; Filing Party: WOO, MIHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 07/16/2020; Filing Party: WOO, MIHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WOO, MIHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WOO, MIHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WOO, MIHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WOO, MIHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WOO, MIHEE

    Read MoreRead Less