This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:23:00 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. WENCESLAO OSORIO

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WENCESLAO OSORIO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WENCESLAO OSORIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/01/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/01/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/17/2014 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/17/2014 01:30:00 PM.

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/24/2014

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/24/2014

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/30/2014

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/30/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/21/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/21/2014

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/15/2014

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/15/2014

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/04/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/04/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/13/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/13/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED ON 01/16/2015) RECEIVED ON 01/16/2015.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED ON 01/16/2015) RECEIVED ON 01/16/2015.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/17/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/17/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2015
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 16562.43 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST OSORIO, WENCESLAO .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED ON 01/16/2015) RECEIVED ON 01/16/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4310375 RECEIVED ON 01/16/2015 12:48:05 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/02/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 477083 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013 11:32:38 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 472485 RECEIVED ON 09/04/2013 10:30:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462367 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 11:54:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less