This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:04 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. TERESA CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TERESA CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

TERESA CHAVEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/18/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/18/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4661837 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4661837 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927487 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751712.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927487 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751712.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/24/2016

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03-17-2017) RECEIVED ON 03/09/2017.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03-17-2017) RECEIVED ON 03/09/2017.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3598966 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2017 08:51:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03-17-2017) RECEIVED ON 03/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3520320 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2017 07:35:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4661837 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4522899 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016 03:45:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927487 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751712.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446587 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:12:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less