This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:14:07 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. SYDNEY GARCIA

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SYDNEY GARCIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SYDNEY GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/26/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/26/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/06/2017

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/06/2017

JUDGMENT (FILED 10/25/13) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

JUDGMENT (FILED 10/25/13) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430470 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254342.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430470 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254342.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

WRIT (ISSUED 06/20/2014) RECEIVED ON 06/16/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED 06/20/2014) RECEIVED ON 06/16/2014.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12084166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11908129.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12084166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11908129.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 12/29/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 12/29/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11613336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11437340.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11613336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11437340.

WRIT (ISSUED 12/29/16) RECEIVED ON 12/29/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 12/29/16) RECEIVED ON 12/29/2016.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12084166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11908129.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 12/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 12/29/16) RECEIVED ON 12/29/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4654946 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2016 12:00:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11613336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11437340.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 06/20/2014) RECEIVED ON 06/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4204521 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2014 11:54:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 353235 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2013 02:11:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430470 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254342.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348143 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 10:54:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less