This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:29:47 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. SAUL ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAUL ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SAUL ALVAREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 05/15/18) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/10/2018

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 05/15/18) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/10/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/10/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/10/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 12/05/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 12/05/2017

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 05/29/2018) RECEIVED ON 05/29/2018.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 05/29/2018) RECEIVED ON 05/29/2018.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/10/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/10/2018

WRIT (ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 4-12-2019) RECEIVED ON 02/25/2019.

WRIT (ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 4-12-2019) RECEIVED ON 02/25/2019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12532079 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12355838.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12532079 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12355838.

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/10/2018

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/10/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12358012 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12181766.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12358012 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12181766.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057969.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057969.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12532079 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12355838.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 4-12-2019) RECEIVED ON 02/25/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2766475 RECEIVED ON 02/25/2019 04:29:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12358012 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12181766.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 05/29/2018) RECEIVED ON 05/29/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1503943 RECEIVED ON 05/29/2018 02:57:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST ALVAREZ, SAUL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4844188 RECEIVED ON 05/10/2018 08:57:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 12/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2618750 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2017 04:19:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057969.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1429288 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 05:55:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.