This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:51:14 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. ROSALBA GARCIA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROSALBA GARCIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ROSALBA GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/18/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928243 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752461.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928243 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752461.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3435958 RECEIVED ON 07/18/2016 09:22:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4537643 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2016 10:43:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928243 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752461.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385389 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:43:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.