This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:18 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. ROBERTO JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERTO JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ROBERTO JIMENEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928002 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752227.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928002 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752227.

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 8/15/16) RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 8/15/16) RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/06/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/06/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/30/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/30/2018

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3631264 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2018 11:22:23 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST JIMENEZ, ROBERTO .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 8/15/16) RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3410873 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2016 09:45:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4537781 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2016 12:49:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928002 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752227.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385332 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:49:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less