This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/20/2017 09:39:37

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Midland Funding Llc against Rebecca Bailey in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number **********************-CJC
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant Rebecca Bailey
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Midland Funding Llc
  • Represented By
    • Kristy Gabrielova
    • David B. Snyder
    • Patrick T. Sullivan

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY MI...

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY MI...

Fees Apply
WRIT (ISSUED 2/06/2017) RECEIVED ON 02/02/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 2/06/2017) RECEIVED ON 02/02/2017.

Fees Apply
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/...

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKET) F...

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKET) F...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; ...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; ...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON ...

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON ...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOU...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOU...

Fees Apply
JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 09/16...

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 09/16...

Fees Apply
EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING L...

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING L...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FU...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FU...

Fees Apply
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MID...

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MID...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/12/2017
  • 06/02/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/02/2017
  • 06/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4733667 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2017 07:54:05 PM.
  • 02/06/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12103162 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11927101.
  • 02/02/2017
  • WRIT (ISSUED 2/06/2017) RECEIVED ON 02/02/2017.
  • 02/06/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4672547 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2017 07:48:14 PM.
  • 09/28/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK
  • 09/28/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.
  • 09/28/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST BAILEY, REBECCA .
  • 09/16/2016
  • EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/16/2016
  • 09/16/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/16/2016
  • 09/16/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/16/2016
  • 09/16/2016
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 09/16/2016.
  • 09/16/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKET) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/16/2016
  • 09/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4607472 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2016 06:53:23 PM.
  • 06/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/08/2016
  • 06/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3422625 RECEIVED ON 06/08/2016 03:39:49 PM.
  • 05/09/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/09/2016
  • 05/10/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2461181 RECEIVED ON 05/09/2016 02:35:49 PM.
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927422 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751647.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.