This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:17:09 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. RAYMOND MARQUEZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAYMOND MARQUEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

RAYMOND MARQUEZ

RAYMOND MARQUEZ JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/26/2014) RECEIVED ON 03/26/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/26/2014) RECEIVED ON 03/26/2014.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/12/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/08/2013.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/12/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/08/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431471 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255343.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431471 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255343.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11566754 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11390619.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11566754 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11390619.

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11566754 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11390619.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/26/2014) RECEIVED ON 03/26/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3128283 RECEIVED ON 03/26/2014 01:15:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 (B&P 6322.1) FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 1383.38 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 258.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST MARQUEZ, RAYMOND JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/12/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/08/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/08/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4105193 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2013 10:38:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 476568 RECEIVED ON 09/12/2013 01:40:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431471 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255343.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2270847 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 04:53:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less