This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/20/2017 09:42:34

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Midland Funding Llc against Pantea Rezaei in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CJC
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Midland Funding Llc
  • Represented By
    • Kristy Gabrielova
    • David B. Snyder
    • Patrick T. Sullivan
  • Defendant Pantea Rezaei
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/...

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) FILED BY M...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) FILED BY M...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDIN...

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDIN...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON ...

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON ...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

Fees Apply
JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 6/8/17) RECEIVED ON 06/06/201...

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 6/8/17) RECEIVED ON 06/06/201...

Fees Apply
E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3627090 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3627090 REJECTED.

Fees Apply
DOCUMENT - OTHER (EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUND...

DOCUMENT - OTHER (EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUND...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER (RE CCP 1033) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING L...

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE CCP 1033) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING L...

Fees Apply
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDL...

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDL...

Fees Apply
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00...

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3627090 REJECTED.
  • 06/08/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK
  • 06/08/2017
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.
  • 06/08/2017
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 4012.24 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST REZAEI, PANTEA .
  • 06/06/2017
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/06/2017
  • 06/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/06/2017
  • 06/06/2017
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (RE CCP 1033) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/06/2017
  • 06/06/2017
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 6/8/17) RECEIVED ON 06/06/2017.
  • 06/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/06/2017
  • 06/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3553752 RECEIVED ON 06/06/2017 08:27:23 PM.
  • 05/22/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/22/2017
  • 05/22/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3548259 RECEIVED ON 05/22/2017 06:41:29 PM.
  • 03/06/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 08/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/08/2016
  • 08/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2484119 RECEIVED ON 08/08/2016 04:29:06 PM.
  • 07/11/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/11/2016
  • 07/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3433339 RECEIVED ON 07/11/2016 08:36:19 AM.
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927501 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751726.
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.