This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:44 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. OTTO SALZER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OTTO SALZER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

OTTO SALZER IV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

MISHAELA GRAVES

DAVID B SNYDER

DEANNA FRASER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752453.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752453.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/06/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/06/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/19/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/14/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/14/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3553253 RECEIVED ON 06/06/2017 09:16:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2463972 RECEIVED ON 05/19/2016 08:40:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4532985 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2016 09:05:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752453.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509825 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:49:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.