This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2018 at 06:08:04 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. OCHOA

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OCHOA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

KATHERINE OCHOA

Respondent

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

DAVID B. SNYDER

DEANNA FRASER

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

PATRICK T SULLIVAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL (08/22/2017) FILED

NOTICE OF APPEAL (08/22/2017) FILED

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER APPELLATE PANEL ON 09/11/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER APPELLATE PANEL ON 09/11/2017.

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS

RECORD ON APPEAL - STATEMENT ON APPEAL

RECORD ON APPEAL - STATEMENT ON APPEAL

RECORD ON APPEAL - CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT

RECORD ON APPEAL - CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY OCHOA, KATHERINE ON 12/15/2017

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY OCHOA, KATHERINE ON 12/15/2017

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY OCHOA, KATHERINE ON 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL - CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL - STATEMENT ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER APPELLATE PANEL ON 09/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (08/22/2017) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISTY GABRIELOVA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MISHAELA J GRAVES