This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 06:54:47 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. MIKE HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIKE HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Mike Hernandez

Riverside, CA 92509-7806

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Camryn P. Berk

Christina Arnold

Michael D. Kahn

Hyo Jin Julia Jung

Jack H. Pogosian

Meline Grigoryan

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/07/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/07/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12909066 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12736925.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12909066 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12736925.

DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 09/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21061719 RECEIVED ON 09/07/2021 08:33:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41218248 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2021 12:44:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12909066 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12736925.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1866546 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2021 11:33:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meline Grigoryan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina Arnold