This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:12 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. MIKE ELAM

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIKE ELAM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MIKE ELAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/09/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/30/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/30/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/16/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927406 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751631.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927406 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751631.

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4592208 RECEIVED ON 08/16/2016 11:21:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2474886 RECEIVED ON 06/30/2016 03:44:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4544659 RECEIVED ON 05/09/2016 02:40:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927406 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751631.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385044 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 08:45:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.