This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 05:28:16 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. MIGUEL TOPIA

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIGUEL TOPIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MIGUEL TOPIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DEANNA FRASER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

CHAD K. CASEY

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/25/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/25/2019

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/25/2019

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/25/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 07/05/2019 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 07/05/2019 10:00:00 AM.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/20/2017

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/20/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12248256 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071978.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12248256 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071978.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2819675 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2019 12:21:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS 07/05/2019 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1442415 RECEIVED ON 11/20/2017 11:53:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12248256 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071978.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4784472 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017 03:55:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEANNA FRASER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAD K CASEY