This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/20/2017 09:52:18

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Midland Funding Llc against Miguel Juarez in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CJC
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant Miguel Juarez
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Midland Funding Llc
  • Represented By
    • Kristy Gabrielova
    • David B. Snyder
    • Patrick T. Sullivan

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/...

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKAGE) ...

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKAGE) ...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; ...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; ...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/19/2016

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

Fees Apply
NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING...

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING...

Fees Apply
JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 08/23/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/04/20...

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 08/23/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/04/20...

Fees Apply
EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING L...

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING L...

Fees Apply
E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4529328 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4529328 REJECTED.

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FU...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FU...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/31/2018
  • 01/31/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1464445 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2018 03:02:10 PM.
  • 08/23/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK
  • 08/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.
  • 08/23/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST JUAREZ, MIGUEL .
  • 08/04/2016
  • EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/04/2016
  • 08/04/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/04/2016
  • 08/04/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/04/2016
  • 08/04/2016
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 08/23/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/04/2016.
  • 08/04/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/04/2016
  • 08/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4586622 RECEIVED ON 08/04/2016 05:38:26 PM.
  • 05/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/19/2016
  • 05/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3415791 RECEIVED ON 05/19/2016 02:36:35 PM.
  • 04/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4529328 REJECTED.
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927510 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751735.
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.