This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:06 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. MICHAEL SHOULDERS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL SHOULDERS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MICHAEL SHOULDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/17/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/17/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927426 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751651.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927426 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751651.

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4662597 RECEIVED ON 01/16/2017 08:34:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3406979 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2016 09:26:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927426 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751651.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509401 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:05:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.