This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:52 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. MARIA UNGRIANO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA UNGRIANO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARIA UNGRIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751694.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751694.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/30/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/30/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 08/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/02/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 08/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/02/2016.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/13/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2635767 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2018 04:41:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST UNGRIANO, MARIA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 08/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/02/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3402838 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2016 05:29:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751694.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446554 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:21:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less