This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. LISA SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LISA SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LISA SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/30/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/30/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12055405 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11879365.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12055405 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11879365.

DOCUMENT - OTHER (EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

DOCUMENT - OTHER (EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/05/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/05/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 11/01/2016) RECEIVED ON 10/26/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/01/2016) RECEIVED ON 10/26/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 06/24/2016) RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 06/24/2016) RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928249 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752467.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928249 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752467.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4810376 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2018 11:25:26 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12055405 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11879365.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 11/01/2016) RECEIVED ON 10/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4626870 RECEIVED ON 10/26/2016 09:36:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST SANCHEZ, LISA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 06/24/2016) RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1315270 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2016 02:34:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928249 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752467.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446846 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:24:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.