This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:32:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. JUAN C MANZANO

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUAN C MANZANO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JUAN C MANZANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/21/2019

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/21/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/25/2018.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/25/2018.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/13/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/13/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/13/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/13/2018 01:30:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/28/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/28/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY MANZANO, JUAN C ON 12/14/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY MANZANO, JUAN C ON 12/14/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/25/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/25/2018

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/25/2018.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/25/2018.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/25/2018

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/25/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/31/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/31/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12358043 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12181797.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12358043 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12181797.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 05/29/2018) RECEIVED ON 05/29/2018.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 05/29/2018) RECEIVED ON 05/29/2018.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/25/2018

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/25/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12288379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12112142.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12288379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12112142.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2765144 RECEIVED ON 02/21/2019 12:03:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12358043 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12181797.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 05/29/2018) RECEIVED ON 05/29/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2675686 RECEIVED ON 05/29/2018 03:14:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MANZANO, JUAN C ON 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MANZANO, JUAN C ON 12/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2616416 RECEIVED ON 11/28/2017 04:30:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234296 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057975.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4776266 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 06:02:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.