This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. JILL DAY

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JILL DAY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JILL DAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

MISHAELA GRAVES

DAVID B SNYDER

DEANNA FRASER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DAY, JILL ON 10/20/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DAY, JILL ON 10/20/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/17/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/17/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/01/2016 01:56:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/01/2016 01:56:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/06/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/06/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752463.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752463.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/31/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/31/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12049575 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11873520.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12049575 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11873520.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4662593 RECEIVED ON 01/16/2017 08:26:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/01/2016 01:56:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 01/24/2017 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12049575 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11873520.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4554697 RECEIVED ON 05/31/2016 10:21:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752463.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385373 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:34:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less