This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:57 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. JENNIFER CHIN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JENNIFER CHIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JENNIFER CHIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEANNA FRASER

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751913.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751913.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/17/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/17/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/29/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/29/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/26/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4568678 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2016 09:46:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4553178 RECEIVED ON 05/26/2016 08:42:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2463274 RECEIVED ON 05/17/2016 10:24:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4537716 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2016 11:51:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751913.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446757 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:41:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.