This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:58 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. JEFFREY SHARP

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEFFREY SHARP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JEFFREY SHARP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

DAVID B. SNYDER

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927546 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751771.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927546 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751771.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/23/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/23/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/15/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/15/2017 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/22/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/22/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/26/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/26/2017

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/24/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/24/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/26/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/26/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/28/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/28/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/23/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/23/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/23/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/23/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3600897 RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017 05:38:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/15/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3570597 RECEIVED ON 07/26/2017 07:35:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4563397 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016 08:57:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3395464 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016 05:42:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927546 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751771.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385175 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:34:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.