This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:26 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. JASON STEWART

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON STEWART. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendants

JASON STEWART

DAVID B. SNYDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

PATRICK T. SULLIVAN

DEANNA FRASER

MISHAELA J. GRAVES

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 07/19/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 07/19/2017 01:30:00 PM.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928190 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752415.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928190 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752415.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 07/19/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/16/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/19/2017 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED SCHEDULED FOR 07/19/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928190 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752415.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446783 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:24:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less