This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/20/2017 09:46:01

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Midland Funding Llc against Jason Hernandez in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CJC
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Midland Funding Llc
  • Represented By
    • Kristy Gabrielova
    • David B. Snyder
    • Patrick T. Sullivan
  • Defendant Jason Hernandez
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/...

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILE...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILE...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/09/2...

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/09/2...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2...

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/24/2...

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/24/2...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

Fees Apply
COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26...

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26...

Fees Apply
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26...

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
  • 06/07/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
  • 06/07/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 06/07/2016
  • 06/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1326214 RECEIVED ON 06/07/2016 05:26:16 PM.
  • 05/09/2016
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/09/2016
  • 05/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2461214 RECEIVED ON 05/09/2016 03:29:50 PM.
  • 04/25/2016
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/25/2016
  • 04/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4537775 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2016 12:44:53 PM.
  • 03/24/2016
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 03/24/2016
  • 03/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1312428 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016 04:52:54 PM.
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927565 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751790.
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385185 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:44:58 AM.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.