This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:28:13 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. JAMES D SUMMERS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMES D SUMMERS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JAMES D SUMMERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2018

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/02/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/02/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234262 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057941.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234262 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057941.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1465274 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2018 11:34:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2630351 RECEIVED ON 01/16/2018 09:47:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234262 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057941.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4776255 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 05:33:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.