This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/20/2017 09:55:04

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Midland Funding Llc against Halenna Vu in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number **********************-CJC
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Midland Funding Llc
  • Represented By
    • Kristy Gabrielova
    • David B. Snyder
    • Patrick T. Sullivan
  • Defendant Halenna Vu
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/...

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKAGE) ...

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKAGE) ...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC O...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC O...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/06/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/06/2016

Fees Apply
PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/05/2...

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/05/2...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHE...

Fees Apply
NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING...

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING...

Fees Apply
JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 08/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/02/20...

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 08/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/02/20...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/20...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/20...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/20...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 01/31/2018
  • 01/31/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4810954 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2018 01:30:44 PM.
  • 08/18/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK
  • 08/18/2016
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.
  • 08/18/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST VU, HALENNA .
  • 08/02/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016
  • 08/02/2016
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 08/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 08/02/2016.
  • 08/02/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016
  • 08/02/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016
  • 08/02/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 08/02/2016
  • 08/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3441852 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2016 04:55:45 PM.
  • 05/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 05/06/2016
  • 05/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3411146 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2016 02:54:20 PM.
  • 04/05/2016
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 04/05/2016
  • 04/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1315291 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2016 03:06:53 PM.
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927508 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751733.
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ON 02/26/2016

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.